HI HB2324 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 201-76, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to expressly place the Pacific International Space Center for Exploration Systems within the Department of Business, Economic Development and Tourism. Removes the Executive Director of the space center as a member of the board and adds the Chancellor of the University of Hawaii at Hilo. (HB2324 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Pacific International Space Center For Exploration Systems.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 628-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Kong, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Quinlan. |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-13-18 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Souki excused (3). |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 79-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-02-18 8:45AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to EDB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2751 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Referred to EDB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 35