HI HB2320 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies chapter 449, Hawaii Revised Statutes, by adding definitions and change in control requirements. Identifies previously authorized fees for initial license issuance; adds a nominal fee for license reissuance upon licensee name change; moves fee for application for proposed change in control to fee section. Authorizes the commissioner to implement use of NMLS, and changes license renewal date from July 1 to December 31 to conform to NMLS. Adds criminal background check and disclosure requirements to licensure and change in control applications, and amends section 846-2.7, Hawaii Revised Statutes, accordingly.
Title
Escrow Depositories; Division of Financial Institutions; Chapter 449D; Chapter 846; Change In Control; Controlling Person; NMLS; Principal; Transfer or Sale; Fee; Criminal Background Check
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 634-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-10 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Brower, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Kawakami. |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-16 at 2:00 PM. |
2016-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-08-16 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2849 (Same As) 2016-07-07 - Act 224, 07/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1326).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2320&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2320_.HTM |