HI SB2849 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Act 224, 07/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1326).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies the escrow depositories law by: adding definitions; authorizing the commissioner of financial institutions to use NMLS for its escrow depositories program; adding criminal history record check and disclosure requirements to licensure and change in control applications; updating the escrow depository license renewal date for consistency with NMLS; clarifying sale or transfer of license or change in control requirements; and updating certain fees. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Escrow Depositories; Division of Financial Institutions; Change in Control; Controlling Person; NMLS; Principal; Transfer or Sale; Fee; License; Criminal History Record Checks

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-07SenateAct 224, 07/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1326).
2016-07-08HouseAct 224, on 07/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1326).
2016-05-09SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2016-05-05SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685).
2016-05-04HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715).
2016-05-03HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott, Souki excused (2).
2016-05-03SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2016-04-29HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16.
2016-04-29HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 89-16) as amended in (CD 1).
2016-04-29Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16.
2016-04-29SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 89-16).
2016-04-29HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Rhoads, Nishimoto, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2016-04-29SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Slom.
2016-04-27SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 10:30AM in conference room 016.
2016-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-16 2:30PM in conference room 016.
2016-04-21SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-16 2:35PM in conference room 016.
2016-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613).
2016-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653).
2016-04-18HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Rhoads, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Pouha.
2016-04-18HouseRe-referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 52
2016-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran, Riviere Co-Chairs; Kidani, Slom.
2016-04-14HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649).
2016-04-14SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2016-04-14SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 582).
2016-04-12HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola voting no (2) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Thielen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2016-04-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6).
2016-04-08HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1628-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2016-04-07HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2016-04-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-07-16 2:01PM in House conference room 308.
2016-04-05HouseRe-referred to FIN, referral sheet 42
2016-03-08HouseReferred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 25
2016-03-08HousePass First Reading
2016-03-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 77) in amended form (SD 1).
2016-03-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Nishihara, Ruderman). Transmitted to House.
2016-03-03SenateOne Day Notice 03-04-16.
2016-03-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2553) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2016-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Taniguchi, Wakai.
2016-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-16 9:30AM in conference room 211.
2016-02-18SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2016-02-18SenateReported from CPH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2370) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2016-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
2016-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2016-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/JDL has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-12-16 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2016-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-16 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2016-01-27SenateReferred to CPH/JDL, WAM.
2016-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2016-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2320 (Same As) 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback