HI HB2303 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the legislature's intent regarding internal deliberative and pre-decisional materials of government agencies. Specifies that certain deliberative and pre-decisional materials that are a direct part of a government agency's internal decision-making process are not subject to disclosure if the disclosure of such materials would impair the agency's ability to make sound and fair decisions, but only to the extent that the impairment outweighs public interest in disclosure. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Uniform Information Practices Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 82). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Sayama voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, D. Kobayashi voting no (2) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 685-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-25-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-22. |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 645-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-16 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2022-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-16-22 9:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 02-16-22 at 9:30 AM. |
2022-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-11-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |