HI HB2302 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to HTH, JDL.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to HTH, JDL.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a behavioral support review process to assess the use of restraints and seclusion of individuals with developmental or intellectual disabilities. Provides disclosure, use, review, and immunity from liability provisions with respect to behavioral support reviews. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB2302 HD2)
Title
Behavioral Support Review of Restraints and Seclusion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDL. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 334). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 894-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Ito, Kawakami, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, C. Lee, Nakashima. |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-21 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-14 at 2:00pm. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-21-14 1:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Awana, Fale, Hanohano, Har, Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll excused (2). |
2014-02-11 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 331-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Woodson. |
2014-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-05-14 8:35AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2852 (Same As) 2014-01-23 - Referred to HTH, JDL.