HI HB2300 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Office of Planning to review and propose updates to the State Planning Act and submit a written report to the Legislature. Makes an appropriation. (HB2300 HD1)
Title
State Planning Act; Office of Planning; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 572-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-12 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-12-16 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-01 | House | Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2829 (Same As) 2016-04-29 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 5:35 PM in Conference Room 423.