HI HB2293 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies membership and certain powers and duties of the Law Enforcement Standards Board, establishes new deadlines for the completion of board responsibilities, and provides appropriate funds and resources to enable the board to accomplish its mission.
Title
Relating To Law Enforcement Standards Board.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2849 (Same As) 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2293&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2293_.HTM |