HI SB2849 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies membership and certain powers and duties of the law enforcement standards board. Establishes deadlines for the completion of board responsibilities. Appropriates funds to enable the board to accomplish its mission. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Law Enforcement Standards Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-11HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
2020-05-11HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1159-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-03-12HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2020-03-11HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-12-20 2:30PM in conference room 325.
2020-03-11HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Thursday, 03-12-20 at 2:30 PM.
2020-03-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-11-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to JUD, FIN , referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 395) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-03-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3392) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Shimabukuro.
2020-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-20 11:05AM in conference room 211.
2020-02-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2020-02-13SenateReported from PSM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2667) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2020-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
2020-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Harimoto.
2020-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on PSM/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to PSM/JDC, WAM.
2020-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2293 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback