HI HB2291 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 4:10PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 4:10PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces the current renewable energy technology systems tax credit with tax credits for solar energy property, wind energy property, and energy storage property. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2016. (SD1)
Title
Geothermal Resources Exploration; Drilling; County Authority; Renewable Energy; Solar and Wind Energy Property; Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 4:10PM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-28 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 708). |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Conferees Added: Senator Baker added as Co-Chair. |
2016-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-28-16 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 225. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 10:30AM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday, 04-27-16 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 225. |
2016-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 9:05AM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-25-16 9:30AM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, McKelvey, Luke Co-Chairs; Pouha. |
2016-04-18 | House | Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 51 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Slom. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 594) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Kidani, Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3576) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Chun Oakland, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Slom. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE will hold a public decision making on 04-07-16 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee on TRE deferred the measure. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-16 9:45AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to TRE/CPH. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 282). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1001-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-03 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Har, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-03-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-03-16 5:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-23 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-24-16 3:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-22 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-24-16 2:00PM. |
2016-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-22-16 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3). |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 443-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2016-02-09 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2016-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-09-16 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-16. |
2016-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-04-16 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-16. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-02-16 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2820 (Same As) 2016-02-25 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.