HI HB228 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB228
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Simplifies the listing process for the designation of plants on the restricted plants list and the noxious weeds list by using the Hawaii Pacific Weed Risk Assessment to prevent the importation, sale, and uncontrolled spread of invasive species. (HB228 HD2)
Title
Relating To Invasive Plants.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2). |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 339) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-08-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-02-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on AGR with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 7) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to AGR. |
2017-01-31 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Say, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto. |
2017-01-30 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-31-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to EEP, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB228 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).