HI HB2278 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies labeling requirements for macadamia nuts to require a disclosure indicating that a product may contain macadamia nuts not grown in Hawaii if the consumer package contains macadamia nuts grown outside the State. Exempts from the labeling requirements products that contain any other ingredient, except seasonings and flavorings, in addition to macadamia nuts. Effective 1/1/2026. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Labeling Of Macadamia Nuts.
Sponsors
Rep. Kirstin Kahaloa [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 53-24). |
2024-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 53-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Richards, Keohokalole, Rhoads, DeCoite; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Nakashima, Kahaloa, Miyake, Nishimoto, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-24 4:30PM in conference room 309. |
2024-04-23 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 767). |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Keohokalole discharged as Chair; Added as Co-Chair. Senator Richards discharged as Member; Added as Chair. |
2024-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-24 11:07AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 762). |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; DeCoite, Richards, Awa. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 792). |
2024-04-19 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Gates, Nakashima, Kahaloa Co-Chairs; Miyake, Nishimoto, Pierick. |
2024-04-19 | House | Re-referred to AGR, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 35 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 671) in amended form (SD 3). |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante, McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Wakai . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-24 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report filed. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 5 offered. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3660) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-24 10:05AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3310) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 332). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Miyake voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 902-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Ilagan; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong, Miyake; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Souza. |
2024-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-23-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 596-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-02-14 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Belatti, Onishi; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam. |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-14-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-09 | House | Re-referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 10 |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to AGR, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2962 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to AEN/CPN, JDC.