HI HB2265 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to adopt rules regulating the activity of watersport excursion companies to provide for increased safety measures. (HB2265 HD1)
Title
Relating To Commercial Ocean Recreation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 280-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, DeCoite, Creagan, Gates, Say, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 02-06-18 9:45AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to OMH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |