HI HB2258 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Women's Corrections Implementation Commission within the Department of Public Safety to provide oversight over state correctional facilities that incarcerate women, receive and investigate complaints from incarcerated women, monitor the criminal justice system's progress in implementing reforms, and monitor programs and data that are important to ensuring successful outcomes for women in the correctional system. Appropriates moneys. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-04 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2). |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 129-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-04 | House | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Friday, 02-04-22 10:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3295 (Same As) 2022-04-20 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).