HI HB2244 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to CPN, JDL.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to CPN, JDL.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain disclosures on collection bins for donated clothing and household items by for-profit and non-profit organizations. Clarifies registration requirement for Hawaii domiciled charitable organizations and by non-profit organizations covered by an IRS Group Exemption Ruling. Authorizes the Attorney General to require electronic financial reporting by professional solicitors. Imposes fines for late financial reports by professional solicitors. Clarifies that commercial co-venturers must provide a final accounting within ninety days. Clarifies exemptions from registration requirements. Makes other technical and housekeeping amendments to Chapter 467B, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Effective July 1, 2112. (HB2244 HD2)
Title
Charitable Solicitation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 316). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 827-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima. |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-25-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Creagan, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 487-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-02-10 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Evans, Har, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Creagan. |
2014-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Monday, 02-10-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Monday, 02-10-14. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-05-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2793 (Same As) 2014-01-23 - Referred to CPN, JDL.