HI HB2242 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for full-time equivalent career foundations certificate program teachers for McKinley Community School for Adults. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-24 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 325). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 931-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kila. |
2024-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-24 1:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Ward excused (2). |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 116-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-01 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-01-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Appropriation
Career Foundations Certificate Program Teachers
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
McKinley Community School for Adults
Career Foundations Certificate Program Teachers
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
McKinley Community School for Adults