HI HB2214 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-28 - Recommitted to CPC with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-28 - Recommitted to CPC with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that condominium association boards may only fill board vacancies to serve until the next annual or duly noticed meeting.
Title
Condominium Associations; Board Vacancies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-28 | House | Recommitted to CPC with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused. |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Woodson excused (2). |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 640-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2014-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-19-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-19-14. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2214&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2214_.HTM |