HI HB2204 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to fund collective bargaining cost items relating to the employer contributions to the Hawaii employer-union health benefits trust fund for fiscal year 2010-2011. Effective July 1, 2010. (HB2204 HD1)
Title
Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund; Appropriation
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused (3). | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 357-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Saiki; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano, Souki, Takumi, Pine; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-02-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-09-10 9:30am in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2393 (Same As) 2010-03-19 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (8).