HI SB2393 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (8).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (8).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to fund collective bargaining cost items relating to the employer contributions to the Hawaii employer-union health benefits trust fund for fiscal year 2010-2011. Requires employer to pay 100 per cent of the administrative fees for 2010-2011. Effective July 1, 2010. (SB2393 HD1)
Title
Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund; Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] | Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] |
Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (8). | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 838-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Saiki, Souki, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. | |
2010-03-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-12-10 10:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 34 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 149) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2450) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Hee, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-10 10:10AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2127) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Hee. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR deferred the measure until 02-04-10 2:45pm in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-10 3:00pm in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to LBR, WAM. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2204 (Same As) 2010-02-12 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused (3).