HI HB2192 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 379).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 379).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the maximum area for each agricultural shade cloth structure, cold frame, and greenhouse that could qualify the structure for an exemption from building permit and building code requirements. Adds language granting county enforcement authorities the right of entry to inspect and enforce violations. Effective upon approval. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Agricultural Buildings.
Sponsors
Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] |
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 379). |
2020-07-02 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2020-07-01 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 555) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-01-20. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Reported from AEN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3721) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM will hold a public decision making on 06-23-20 12:30PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 03-17-20 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-20 1:45PM in conference room 224. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred to AEN/PSM. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 8). |
2020-02-18 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Lowen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-14 | House | Deferred one day 02-18-20. |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 681-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-12-20 10:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2). |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 121-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLH. |
2020-01-31 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Holt, Onishi, Perruso, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-30 | House | Re-referred to AGR, WLH, referral sheet 9 |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 01-31-20 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR, WLH, CPC, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |