HI HB2161 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred to CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred to CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that all condominiums may amend their declarations by the vote or written consent of owners representing at least sixty-seven per cent of the common interest, unless amended by the unit owners to require a higher percentage. Clarifies provisions concerning the installation of solar energy devices on common elements or limited common elements. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Condominiums.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 320). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1019-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Say, Thielen. |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-28-20 2:15PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 656-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:05PM in conference room 329. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-20. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:05PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3043 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.