HI HB2132 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits denying a student a meal for the first: (1) thirty days of a semester while the student's application for free or reduced lunch is being processed; or (2) week the student's meal fund balance is zero or negative. Authorizes DOE to adopt rules or policies on the collection of funds for negative student meal balances.
Title
Department of Education; Meals; Students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 311-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-03 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Kong, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Ito. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-03-16 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2426 (Same As) 2016-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2132&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2132_.HTM |