HI HB2125 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires every pharmacy to accept for disposal the return of any unused, remaining, or expired prescription drug that the pharmacy previously dispensed. (HB2125 HD1)
Title
Relating To Prescription Drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 424-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-08 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 02-08-18 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to HHS, CPC, referral sheet 7 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2339 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.