HI SB2339 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes pharmacies to accept for disposal the return of any unused, remaining, or expired prescription drugs that the pharmacy previously dispensed, via collection receptacles or mail-back programs. (SB2339 HD1)
Title
Relating To Prescription Drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-03-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-28-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, McKelvey, Souki, Todd, Ward excused (6). |
2018-03-21 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1265-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-03-13 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Tuesday, 03-13-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HHS, CPC, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 151) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2534) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2125 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).