HI HB211 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of land and natural resources and the department of agriculture to work with the taro security and purity task force to identify taro lands, adjust lease rents, and modify lease qualification criteria.
Title
Agriculture; Affordable Taro Lands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Re-referred to WLO/AGR, HAW, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to WLO/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=211 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB211_.HTM |