HI HB2104 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund from disclosing under chapter 92F, Hawaii Revised Statutes, certain types of alternative investment fund information. Effective 12/25/2040. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund Investments.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) Holt, Ward excused (2). |
2022-02-14 | House | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 223-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-08 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 02-08-22 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3072 (Same As) 2022-06-17 - Act 075, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175).