HI SB3072 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 075, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 075, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the Hawaii employer-union health benefits trust fund from being required to disclose certain types of alternative investment fund information under the Uniform Information Practices Act. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund Investments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Act 075, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175). |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Act 075, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1175). |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-09 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 957). |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 05-05-22. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 05-05-22. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-08-22 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Sayama Co-Chairs; Okimoto. |
2022-04-08 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-08-22. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 403). |
2022-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso, Tam, Wildberger voting no (4) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1685-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso, Wildberger; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, McDermott. |
2022-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-31-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1394-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-22 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 03-22-22 9:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 418) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3140) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from LCA/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2527) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 10:31AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to LCA/JDC, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2104 (Same As) 2022-02-23 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.