HI HB210 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-22-16 3:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-22-16 3:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of the Prosecuting Attorney of the City and County of Honolulu for the Career Criminal Prosecution Unit. Effective 7/1/2076. (SD2)
Title
Honolulu Prosecuting Attorney Package; Grant-in-Aid; Career Criminal Prosecution Unit; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-22-16 3:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi Co-Chairs; Espero, Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, Johanson Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 503). |
2016-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 478) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-16. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3365) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Wakai. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-16 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported from PSM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3038) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, K.Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-16 8:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 162). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Jordan, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 814) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1). |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 258), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-10 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Thielen. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-10-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-15 at 2:00 pm in room 325. |
2015-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-06-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB423 (Same As)