HI HB2091 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Lowen, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Lowen, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits agricultural tourism uses and activities, including overnight accommodations, in conjunction with bona fide farming operations on agricultural district lands statewide and establishes operational and income requirements. (HB2091 HD1)
Title
Agricultural Tourism; Agricultural District Lands; Bona Fide Farming Operation
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Lowen, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from AGR/TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 333-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-10 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Ohno, Kong, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Kawakami, Tokioka. |
2016-02-10 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Kong, Ohno, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Kawakami, Tokioka. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/TOU on Wednesday, 02-10-16 10:15AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR/TOU, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |