HI HB2070 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires counties to develop procedures to accept private donations of land that is damaged or likely to be damaged by natural disasters or climate change. Authorizes taxpayers to receive a charitable income tax deduction for the donations. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2020. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 321-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |