HI HB2070 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-27 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-27 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the terms of service for principals and vice principals from 12 months to 10 months. Returns principals and vice principals to 12-month terms of service if performance contracts for principals are established by the 2011-2012 school year.
Title
Principals and Vice Principals; 10-Month Terms of Service
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-27 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN/LAB on Wednesday, 01-27-10 2:00 pm in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to EDN/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2255 (Same As) 2010-01-21 - (S) Referred to EDH/LBR, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2070&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB2070_.HTM |