HI HB2066 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the amount of campaign funds that may be spent by an elected official on memberships in civic or community groups or on protocol gifts to twice the allowable individual contribution amount. (HB2066 HD1)
Title
Elections; Campaign Funds; Expenditure Limits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 11:02AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 510-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-16 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Woodson. |
2016-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-16-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 02-16-16 at 2:00 PM in room 325. |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-11-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |