HI HB2064 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an income tax credit for taxpayers with an adjusted gross income of $100,000 or less who purchase bus passes or passes for a public transportation program. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB2064 HD1)
Title
Public Transportation Tax Credit
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2). |
2014-02-11 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 289-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-03 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Takayama, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Nakashima, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-03-14 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |