HI HB2044 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-02 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-07-24 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-02 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-07-24 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Digital Equity Grant Program to award grants to applicants to deploy digital equity projects to covered populations in the State. Establishes the Broadband and Digital Equity Special Fund.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Broadband And Digital Equity Office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-07-24 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-07-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to HET, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3248 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - Referred to EET, WAM.
Subjects
Broadband Access
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Digital Equity Grant Program
Digital Literacy
Hawaii Broadband and Digital Equity Office
Special Fund ($)
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Digital Equity Grant Program
Digital Literacy
Hawaii Broadband and Digital Equity Office
Special Fund ($)
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2044&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2044_.HTM |