HI HB2042 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Improves the regulation of occupational therapists and occupational therapy assistants by establishing an occupational therapy program and licensing requirements for occupational therapists and occupational therapy assistants.
Title
Occupational Therapy; Occupational Therapists; Occupational Therapy Assistants; Regulation; Licensing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-19-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-19-14. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2472 (Same As) 2014-07-08 - Act 209, on 7/2/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2042&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2042_.HTM |