HI SB2472 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Act 209, on 7/2/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Act 209, on 7/2/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Improves the regulation of occupational therapists and occupational therapy assistants by establishing an occupational therapy program and licensing requirements for occupational therapists and occupational therapy assistants. Makes an appropriation out of the compliance resolution fund to implement an occupational therapy licensure program. (CD1)
Title
Occupational Therapy; Occupational Therapists; Occupational Therapy Assistants; Regulation; Licensing; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | House | Act 209, on 7/2/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319). |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-24 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 48-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-24 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 48-14). |
2014-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, McKelvey, Morikawa, Creagan, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 5:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 5:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-14 8:50AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 12:30PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, McKelvey, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Creagan, Kobayashi, Fukumoto Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Baker, Chun Oakland Co-Chairs; L. Thielen, Slom Members. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 578). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Belatti, Oshiro excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1613-14) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Hashem, Woodson, Ward. |
2014-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-01-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-21 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1216-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Evans, Har, Ito, Nakashima, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Oshiro, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen. |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-19-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Tokioka, Yamashita excused (4). |
2014-03-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 950-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2014-03-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. |
2014-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-12-14 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 206) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2615) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2377) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HTH/CPN, WAM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2042 (Same As) 2014-02-19 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.