HI HB2013 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to upgrade the Department of Land and Natural Resources' Division of Conservation and Resources Enforcement's trucks currently in use in Hawaii county. (HB2013 HD2)
Title
Relating To The Division Of Conservation And Resources Enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 298). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1116-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-16 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakamura. |
2018-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Souki excused (3). |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 99-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-01-31 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Cullen, Kong, Lowen, McKelvey, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2018-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 01-31-18 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2995 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.