HI HB2004 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends requirements for child passengers. Requires rear facing child safety seats for children under two years of age. Raises certain fines for violations. Effective upon approval. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Child Passenger Restraints.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2020-05-12SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3442) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2020-03-09SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English.
2020-03-06SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-20 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to TRS, JDC.
2020-03-03SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 159).
2020-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 927-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-25HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Nakashima, Yamane.
2020-02-24HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:30PM in conference room 325.
2020-02-24HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-20 at 2:30pm.
2020-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-24-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2020-02-11HouseRe-referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 27
2020-02-05HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2).
2020-02-05HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 100-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2020-01-31HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Matayoshi, Woodson, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
2020-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 01-31-20 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
2020-01-23HouseReferred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2106 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback