HI SB2106 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends requirements for child passengers. Requires rear facing child safety seats for children under two years of age. Raises certain fines for violations. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Child Passenger Restraints.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 121) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, J.Keohokalole. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3259) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:00PM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2397) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-20 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2004 (Same As) 2020-05-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.