PA SB232 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school health services, further providing for health services.
Title
In school health services, further providing for health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 232 PN 637, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 232 PN 146, 2023 A326, BROOKS Amendment No. A-0326 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 232 PN 146, 2023 A326, BROOKS Amendment No. A-0326 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2023-04-26 | House | In the House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-1) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (49-1) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-03-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |