HI HB1995 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to EEP/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to EEP/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates that fifty per cent of all heavy-duty motor vehicles in the State's fleet be hydrogen vehicles by an unspecified date. Mandates that one hundred per cent of all heavy-duty motor vehicles in the State's fleet be hydrogen vehicles by December 31, 2035. Defines heavy-duty motor vehicle and hydrogen vehicle.
Title
Relating To State Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to EEP/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2967 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
Subjects
Department of Transportation
Heavy-Duty Motor Vehicles
Hydrogen Motor Vehicles
State Fleet
Zero Emissions
Heavy-Duty Motor Vehicles
Hydrogen Motor Vehicles
State Fleet
Zero Emissions
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1995&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1995_.HTM |