HI HB1987 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a youth gang information program in the office of youth services. Appropriates funds for the development of prevention and intervention services and programs statewide for youth at risk, and to monitor gang activities and establish new gang prevention strategies and projects. Takes effect on 7/1/2060. (SD1)
Title
Youth Gangs; Prevention and Intervention; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported from HMS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2989) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Green, Harimoto, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-16 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HMS/PSM, WAM. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 91). |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 783-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 11:02AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-19 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 609-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-02-18 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-18-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2016-02-12 | House | Reported from HUS/EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 271-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-11 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ito, Kong, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ing, Say, Tsuji. |
2016-02-11 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/EDN on Thursday, 02-11-16 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-29 | House | Re-referred to HUS/EDN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |