HI HB1970 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii apprentice hunting license program. Allows a license holder to participate in hunting under certain conditions.
Title
Relating To Hunting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Souki excused (3). |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 103-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-01-31 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Cullen, Kong, Lowen, McKelvey, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2018-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 01-31-18 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2844 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1970&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1970_.HTM |