HI HB1961 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-19 - (H) Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-19 - (H) Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires cigarettes and tobacco products to be stored for sale behind a counter. Requires advertisements that promote or encourage the purchase or use of cigarettes or tobacco products to be placed twenty-five feet away from children's products, toys, cookies, candy, ice cream, gum, or snacks. Requires advertisements that promote or encourage the purchase or use of cigarettes or tobacco products to be placed four feet off the floor. Permits exceptions for retail tobacco stores, bars, or establishments where the minimum age for admission is eighteen.
Title
Tobacco; Tobacco Products; Advertisements
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2425 (Same As) 2012-02-17 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to EDT.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1961 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1961_.HTM |