HI HB1954 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides reimbursements by medicaid and its contracted health plans to hospitals for patients occupying acute-licensed beds who are waitlisted for long-term care and to facilities with long-term care beds for patients with medically-complex conditions who prior to admission to the facility were receiving acute care services in an acute care hospital. Effective July 1, 2012.
Title
Medicaid Reimbursements
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Jessica Wooley [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 157-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-02 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. | |
2012-02-02 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. | |
2012-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Thursday, 02-02-12 10:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |