HI HB1948 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to IAC, HHS, CPC, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to IAC, HHS, CPC, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the licensing requirements for hearing aid dealers and fitters shall not apply to audiologists licensed pursuant to chapter 468E, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Relating To Licensing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to IAC, HHS, CPC, referral sheet 5 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2258 (Same As) 2018-07-11 - Act 173, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1948&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1948_.HTM |