HI SB2258 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 173, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 173, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the licensing requirements for hearing aid dealers and fitters shall not apply to audiologists licensed pursuant to chapter 468E, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Clarifies that to be eligible for licensure as an audiologist, a person shall not be required to also be licensed as a hearing aid dealer and fitter. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Licensing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 173, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 173, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours noticeTuesday, 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 17-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 17-18). |
2018-04-20 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Ohno, Takumi, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-18 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 786). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Tokuda. |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Ohno, Takumi Co-Chairs; Ito, Tupola. |
2018-04-16 | House | Re-referred to HHS, IAC, CPC, referral sheet 57 |
2018-04-06 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 574). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 454). |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-05-18. |
2018-04-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1757-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, Mizuno, Say, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tokioka. |
2018-03-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-28-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1477-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 03-22-18 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-20 | House | Re-referred to HHS, CPC, referral sheet 43 |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to IAC, HHS, CPC, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-02 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 32) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Galuteria, Ihara, Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-01-18. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2529) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1948 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - Referred to IAC, HHS, CPC, referral sheet 5