HI HB1936 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renames Hawaii's Electric Vehicle Charging System Rebate Program to the Zero-Emission Vehicle Fueling System Rebate Program. Adds the installation and upgrade of hydrogen refueling stations to the Zero-Emission Vehicle Fueling System Rebate Program.
Title
Relating To Zero Emission Vehicle Fueling Rebates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-08-22 8:50AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2570 (Same As) 2022-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Subjects
Electric Vehicle Charging System
Hydrogen Refueling Station
Rebate Program
Zero-Emission Vehicle Fueling System
Hydrogen Refueling Station
Rebate Program
Zero-Emission Vehicle Fueling System
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1936&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1936_.HTM |