HI HB1927 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, San Buenaventura, Say excused (3).
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, San Buenaventura, Say excused (3).
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a tax credit for individual and corporate taxpayers that provide either solar-powered air conditioning units or solar energy systems specifically designed to provide electricity for air conditioning units for schools. (HB1927 HD1)
Title
Solar; Tax Credit; Schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, San Buenaventura, Say excused (3). |
2016-02-08 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 73-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2016-02-04 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-04-16 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-16. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-02-16 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |