HI HB1926 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires any state agency that requires a person to submit information, data, or other materials to create a form, including instructions, that is written in plain language, to facilitate the collection of that information, data, or material.
Title
Relating To State Forms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2375 (Same As) 2020-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1926&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1926_.HTM |