HI HB1917 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Cullen, Keith-Agaran, Yamane voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Cullen, Keith-Agaran, Yamane voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies to adopt and implement a written policy on domestic violence committed or allegedly committed by law enforcement officers of the agency by January 1, 2013. Specifies minimum policy standards that must be met by the agency. Establishes policy training deadlines. Specifies penalties for employees of law enforcement agencies who violate the domestic violence policy. Appropriates money for county law enforcement and relevant state agencies. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB1917 HD1)
Title
Domestic Violence Policy; Law Enforcement Agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Cullen, Keith-Agaran, Yamane voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2). | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Reported from HUS/PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 277-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, Luke, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Saiki, Souki, Takai, Takumi. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Yamane; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Wooley, Ching, Pine. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/PBM on Thursday, 02-09-12 11:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to HUS/PBM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |